Accounts and annual returns THE ORIEL SINGERS OF CHELTENHAM

Charity number: 1182849
Charity reporting is up to date (140 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 November 2024 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 October 2021 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required