PENINSULA EDUCATION PROGRAMME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Peninsula Education Programme (PEP) is a UK based charity that provides a free literacy programme to adults in the Peninsula of Freetown, Sierra Leone, who did not receive a formal education. PEP fundraises in order to pay for: 1. Staff facilitating the programme 2. Teaching and learning materials 3. Maintenance of the education centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 28 October 2019: Standard registration
- PEP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CATHERINE OKRAFO-SMART | Chair | 04 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL OKRAFO-SMART | Trustee | 04 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNA STANLEY | Trustee | 04 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.92k | £3.33k | £6.23k | £5.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.50k | £8.80k | £4.02k | £3.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2022 | 328 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG ADULTS (AGED 18+), IN SIERRA LEONE, WHO HAVE NEVER HAD ACCESS TO A FORMAL EDUCATION, IN THE SUBJECTS OF LITERACY, NUMERACY AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AN EDUCATION PROGRAMME DELIVERED WITHIN AN EDUCATION CENTRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 CHEVIOT GARDENS
LONDON
NW2 1QE
- Phone:
- 00442084585224
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window