FUTUREHOPE - HERTFORD AND WARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUTUREHOPE AIM IS TO PROVIDE AN EFFECTIVE AND ACCESSIBLE MENTORING SERVICE TO YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 11 AND 18 INCLUSIVE IN HERTFORDSHIRE IN ORDER TO REDUCE ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR, SOCIAL EXCLUSION AND CRIMINAL OFFENDING, SO AS TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £400 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 12 November 2019: CIO registration
- 09 August 2022: Funds received from 1173953 HERTFORD YOUTH CLUB
- FUTUREHOPE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Haddon Tyler | Chair | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Thompson | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Barker | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.61k | £75.63k | £69.72k | £87.21k | £93.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.04k | £60.43k | £52.67k | £70.71k | £68.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £500 | £10.70k | £400 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Nov 2019 as amended on 18 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AN EFFECTIVE AND ACCESSIBLE MENTORING SERVICE TO YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 11 AND 18 INCLUSIVE IN HERTFORDSHIRE IN ORDER TO REDUCE ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR, SOCIAL EXCLUSION AND CRIMINAL OFFENDING, SO AS TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pioneer Hall
11 Ware Road
HERTFORD
SG13 7DZ
- Phone:
- 01992534915
- Email:
- info@fhhw.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window