Financial history LAJPUR MUSLIM SOCIETY U.K.

Charity number: 1184034
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.41k £76.45k £144.08k £67.71k £60.42k
Total expenditure £9.24k £83.90k £134.81k £65.83k £36.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A