FARINGDON UNITED CHARITY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist persons resident in the Area of Benefit who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress. To advance the education of boys and girls resident in the Area of Benefit who, in the opinion of the charity trustees, are in need of financial assistance. 'Area of Benefit' shall mean the Parishes of Great Faringdon, Little Coxwell, Littleworth and surrounding parishes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 26 November 2019: CIO registration
- 01 October 2024: Funds received from 237040 FARINGDON UNITED CHARITY
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Howard Keeling | Chair | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kiera Bentley | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Maria Jukes | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Katherine Hyland | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
JULIE FARMER | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Finn | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Stephen Philip Coleman | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
GENEVIEVE WEBB | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Corfield | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Ann Barber | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD THOMAS JARMAN | Trustee | 09 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £414.74k | £267.02k | £239.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £44.12k | £119.87k | £119.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 February 2022 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 February 2022 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1.1. TO THE VICAR OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, FARINGDON £0.50 FOR PREACHING A SERMON ON CHRISTMAS DAY IN THE PARISH CHURCH; 3.1.2. TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. 3.1.3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. 'AREA OF BENEFIT' SHALL MEAN THE PARISHES OF GREAT FARINGDON, LITTLE COXWELL, LITTLEWORTH AND ADJACENT PARISHES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Church
Church Street
FARINGDON
Oxfordshire
SN7 8AD
- Phone:
- 01367243789
- Email:
- davidhkeeling@gmail.com
- Website:
-
faringdonunitedcharities.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window