SOUTH PARK EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the physical, mental and social needs of local residents considered to be from disadvantaged back grounds within the south western area of Seven Kings by providing them with educational, spiritual and pastoral assistance in a supportive environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Redbridge
Governance
- 26 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abdul Patel | Chair | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Khalik | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Javid Patel | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.14k | £2.91k | £3.55k | £12.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.04k | £7.55k | £3.88k | £7.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 March 2022 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 137 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PRESCHOOL AND PRIMARY SCHOOL AGE CHILDREN WITHIN THE SOUTH WESTERN AREA OF SEVEN KINGS:- 1.TO PRESERVE PROTECT THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH THROUGH THE PROVISIONS SUPPORT AND PRACTICAL GUIDANCE AND ADVICE; AND 2.TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
203 South Park Drive
Seven Kings
Ilford
Essex
England
IG3 9AJ
- Phone:
- 07957 647 631
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window