GRAND DUCHESS ELIZABETH ROMANOV SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to advance knowledge and education for the public benefit in the history of Britain and Russia. We promote the memory of Grand Duchess Elizabeth (1864-1918), the granddaughter of Queen Victoria, and other members of the Russian Imperial House and aristocratic families. We operate a website, organise conferences, exhibitions, trips, publish books and a magazine. We erected a monument.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 August 2019: Standard registration
- 06 November 2023: Funds received from 1183788 THE IMPERIAL ORTHODOX PALESTINE SOCIETY
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maria Natalia Harwood | Chair | 04 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Marina Scirska | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Oxborrow | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alexander Stephen Groves | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Scriven | Trustee | 12 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Harwood | Trustee | 04 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.74k | £5.25k | £4.94k | £1.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £971 | £3.82k | £5.53k | £990 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 DEC 2015 AS AMENDED ON 28 JUL 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE HISTORY OF BRITAIN AND RUSSIA IN THE 19TH AND 20TH CENTURIES BY:- 1. ORGANISING CONFERENCES, LECTURES, PUBLICATIONS, EXHIBITIONS AND CULTURAL EVENTS; 2. SPREADING KNOWLEDGE ABOUT THE LIFE AND PERSONALITY OF GRAND DUCHESS ELIZABETH (A GRANDDAUGHTER OF QUEEN VICTORIA, WHO WAS MARTYRED DURING THE RUSSIAN REVOLUTION), AND OTHER MEMBERS OF THE HOUSE OF ROMANOV CLOSELY RELATED TO THE BRITISH ROYAL FAMILY; 3. PROVIDING RESOURCES FOR EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS WHERE RELEVANT TOPICS ARE TAUGHT. 4. STIMULATING HISTORICAL RESEARCH IN ARCHIVES & LIBRARIES (BOTH PUBLIC & PRIVATE) IN BRITAIN, RUSSIA AND GERMANY, & TO MAKE THEM AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC; 5. ASSISTING INITIATIVES COMING FROM LOCAL COMMUNITIES OF MARKING HISTORICALLY SIGNIFICANT PLACES (WITH PLAQUES, MEMORIALS AND SCULPTURES) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND 6. ORGANISING EDUCATIONAL VISITS TO HISTORICAL PLACES IN BRITAIN AND ABROAD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 CHARLES ROAD
ST. LEONARDS-ON-SEA
TN38 0QH
- Phone:
- 07503213750
- Email:
- nd2315@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window