KINYAN HATORAH UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the orthodox Jewish faith for the public benefit in such ways as the charity trustees think fit and in particular but without limitation by establishing managing and supporting a learning centre in North West London and through the holding of educational events, public lectures, trips to Israel and celebrations of religious festivals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Michael Isaacs | Chair | 12 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Jason David Ben-Zion | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Benjamin Jacob Cohen | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.71k | £55.95k | £146.32k | £187.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.74k | £51.03k | £140.22k | £184.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY ESTABLISHING MANAGING AND SUPPORTING A LEARNING CENTRE IN NORTH WEST LONDON AND THROUGH THE HOLDING OF EDUCATIONAL EVENTS, PUBLIC LECTURES, TRIPS TO ISRAEL AND CELEBRATIONS OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
First floor
12 Russell Parade
Golders Green Road
London
NW11 9NN
- Phone:
- 0207 100 6013
- Email:
- lee@cedardean.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window