THRIVE LEEDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Thrive Leeds is a partnership between four local churches who work alongside children and young people in the local area. We work with 0-18 year olds and their families, and love to give space for them to gather together, find support and friendship, feel valued and think through things that are important to them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £6,857 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
52 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 11 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Bolton Cundall | Chair | 13 February 2019 |
|
|||||||
Rev Phillip Hatton | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Nicola Anne Robinson | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Mark Colin Stennett | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rev Simon Nicholas Jones | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Catherine Lucy Armstrong | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Emmanuelle Bastide-Wilson | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Oakley Wilkins Copeland | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.76k | £37.88k | £65.83k | £82.18k | £89.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.61k | £32.42k | £41.18k | £51.38k | £116.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE AREA OF BENEFIT IS THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA SERVED BY THE PARTNER CHURCHES IN LEEDS. THE OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE PARTNER CHURCHES. 3.2 TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES THROUGH: 3.2.1 THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3.2.2 PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chapel Allerton Methodist Church
Town Street
Chapel Allerton
LEEDS
LS7 4NB
- Phone:
- 01133201350
- Email:
- contact@thriveleeds.org.uk
- Website:
-
thriveleeds.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window