NEOTREE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING TECHNOLOGY, SOFTWARE, INFORMATION, EDUCATION AND SUPPORT TO HEALTHCARE WORKERS AND MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS AND THE CARRYING OUT OF RELATED RESEARCH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £96,056 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Malawi
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 05 December 2019: Standard registration
- NEOTREE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- NEOTREE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Peter Catherall | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Herzog Parsons | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Yali Sassoon | Trustee | 22 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Felicity Caroline Scarlet Fitzgerald | Trustee | 03 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michelle Riley | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.48k | £31.21k | £81.95k | £235.20k | £263.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.27k | £1.26k | £42.26k | £224.82k | £300.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £78.40k | £96.06k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 July 2021 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 APR 2019 AS AMENDED ON 01 JUN 2020 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 OCT 2021 as amended on 02 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING TECHNOLOGY, SOFTWARE, INFORMATION, EDUCATION AND SUPPORT TO HEALTHCARE WORKERS AND MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS AND THE CARRYING OUT OF RELATED RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Blossom Yard
Fourth Floor
LONDON
E1 6RS
- Phone:
- 07838362358
- Email:
- neotreeapp@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window