Accounts and annual returns THE HAPPY PANTS RANCH
Charity number: 1185169

Charity reporting is overdue by 135 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 135 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 135 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 26 February 2025 | 426 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
28 February 2023
(These accounts |
26 February 2025 | 426 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 22 January 2024 | 390 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
28 February 2022
(These accounts |
22 January 2024 | 390 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 22 December 2022 | 359 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window