BRISTOL AFTER STROKE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the charity is the support of those who have recovered from a stroke, their families and carers. The main activities to achieve this objective are information, advice and emotional support to individuals, the running of weekly social groups, provision of counselling and liaising with health professionals in the Bristol and South Gloucestershire areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £250,183 from 1 government contract(s) and £96,828 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
47 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 19 February 2019: Standard registration
- 04 May 2022: Funds received from 287554 BRISTOL AREA STROKE FOUNDATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Claire Smethurst | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Knowles | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Stephen Hill | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hill | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Exell | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Scott | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £177.23k | £205.18k | £458.19k | £475.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £232.75k | £281.41k | £422.81k | £484.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £21.46k | £250.18k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £105.20k | £109.31k | £94.14k | £96.83k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 FEB 2019
Charitable objects
2.1 THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH IN RELATION TO STROKES AND ALLIED MEDICAL CONDITIONS BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO ACTIVITIES SUPPORTING PREVENTION AND FACILITATING THE TREATMENT AND THE REHABILITATION OF PATIENTS. 2.2 THE ABOVE PURPOSES ARE THE CHARITY’S CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE 2011 ACT. FOR AS LONG AS THE CHARITY IS REGISTERED AS A CHARITY IN ENGLAND AND WALES, ITS PURPOSES MAY ONLY BE ALTERED WITH THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE COMMISSION AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY CONDITIONS ATTACHED TO SUCH CONSENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gatehouse Centre
HARECLIVE ROAD
BRISTOL
- Phone:
- 01179647657
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window