Accounts and annual returns FRODSHAM JUNIOR FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1182350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 26 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 26 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 26 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 26 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 14 May 2023 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 14 May 2023 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 20 May 2022 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 20 May 2022 20 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window