Financial history FRODSHAM JUNIOR FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity Number: 1182350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £96.29k £58.50k £122.98k £103.97k £135.04k
Total expenditure £89.05k £61.14k £106.74k £129.82k £138.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A