HAMBLE HEDGEHOGS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We rescue, rehabilitate and release wild European hedgehogs. We also run education workshops within schools and other institutions as well as providing information and support via social media.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 23 September 2019: CIO registration
- Hamble Hedgehogs Rescue (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nina-Carol Gilroy Mrs | Chair | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Rudge | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
IAN WAUGH | Trustee | 06 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAISY-VICTORIA MEADHAM | Trustee | 06 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES GILROY | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2021 | 01/03/2022 | 01/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.10k | £6.84k | £2.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.00k | £6.12k | £2.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 147 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 147 days | |
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 231 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | 27 March 2025 | 451 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | 09 July 2023 | 189 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | 27 March 2025 | 816 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO FURTHER THE CONSERVATION AND PRESERVATION OF THE HEDGEHOG SPECIES PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE SOUTHAMPTON POSTCODE AREA; 2) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF HEDGEHOGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY PROVIDING A RESCUE, CARE AND REHABILITATION SERVICE FOR SICK, INJURED, OR ORPHANED HEDGEHOGS WITH THE AIM OF RELEASING SUCH HEDGEHOGS BACK INTO THE WILD WHEREVER POSSIBLE; 3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY OF HEDGEHOGS AND IN THE CARE, METHODS OF TREATMENT, CONSERVATION AND HABITAT OF HEDGEHOGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hamble Hedgehogs Rescue
169 Ellwood Avenue
Thornhill
Southampton
Hampshire
SO19 6BG
- Phone:
- 07874833292
- Email:
- MAIL@HAMBLEHEDGEHOGS.COM
- Website:
-
WWW.HAMBLEHEDGEHOGS.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window