YNYS MON COUNTY FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Young Farmers Movement which provides the means to advance the education and personal development of young people of the public in all aspects of rural life. It is an organisation run by the members for the members on Anglesey.It provides for all types of training, recreation and leisure time occupations so as to advance their development as confident, self-reliant individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £30,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Isle Of Anglesey
Governance
- 30 March 1983: Standard registration
- MUDIAD FFERMWYR IFANC YNYS MON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RHYS ELLIS RICHARDS | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.24k | £54.09k | £56.63k | £85.95k | £66.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.45k | £38.62k | £41.73k | £79.78k | £79.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.00k | £30.00k | £32.50k | £30.00k | £30.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 NOVEMBER 1959 AS AMENDED 25 NOVEMBER 1971 AND 29 NOVEMBER 1973
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, IN AGRICULTURE, HOME CRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE & RELATED SUBJECTS; AND (B) IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH MEMBERS TO PROVIDE, AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS, BEING FACILITIES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND WILL ASSIST IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR SPIRITUAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES, SELF-RELIANCE AND INDIVIDUAL RESPONSIBILITY SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNTIY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CANOLFAN FFERMWYR IFANC MON
MAES SIOE MON
GWALCHMAI
HOLYHEAD
YNYS MON
LL65 4RW
- Phone:
- 01407 720256
- Email:
- ynys.mon@yfc-wales.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window