THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST OSWALD, CROXLEY GREEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORT TO THE PARISH CLERGY IN PROVIDING CHRISTIAN RELIGIOUS SERVICES WITHIN THE ANGLICAN CHURCH OPEN TO THE WHOLE COMMUNITY, PASTORAL VISITING AND EDUCATIONAL OUTREACH WORK WITHIN ST OSWALD'S PARISH. USE FOR OTHER PARISH FUNDS TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND NEED WITHIN AND OUTSIDE THE PARISH. DONATIONS TO OTHER CHARITIES AND USE OF CHURCH HALL AS A MEETING VENUE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 08 April 2019: Standard registration
- ST OSWALD'S PCC, CROXLEY GREEN (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Robert James Riley-Braley | Chair | 28 April 2008 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Louise Mackay | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Leslie Clifford | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Ann Edwards | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elizabeth Hook | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Georgina Barnes | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Stephen Restarick | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Alison Cox | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Coutts Doughty | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Celia Christina McAlpine | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Cathryn Williamson | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Mark Cox | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Mary Clifford | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Paul Thomson | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Naomi Thomas | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Guy Howard Parks | Trustee | 19 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Anthony William Barton | Trustee | 29 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
Karen Dawn Pryse | Trustee | 22 April 1997 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.59k | £100.89k | £109.78k | £114.23k | £126.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.83k | £96.86k | £96.13k | £110.05k | £110.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Oswalds Church
Malvern Way
Croxley Green
RICKMANSWORTH
WD3 3QL
- Phone:
- 01923334455
- Email:
- info@stoswaldschurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window