Financial history HELEN ATKIN GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1182183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £43.59k £76.77k £104.22k £44.10k £46.48k
Total expenditure £11.47k £3.20k £208.92k £28.99k £37.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A