WALLINGTON ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wallington Animal Rescue is a non-profit voluntary charity dedicated to the rescuing of domestic animals based in South London. The rescue continuously strives to reduce the population of homeless or unwanted animals by providing support and advice for animal welfare, rescuing, fostering and re-homing animals and promoting spay/neutering awareness programmes within our local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bromley
- Croydon
- Merton
- Surrey
- Sutton
Governance
- 17 September 2019: CIO registration
- WAR (WALLINGTON ANIMAL RESCUE) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Blackwell | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Waters | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Waters | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Quaile | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Garton | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.06k | £40.27k | £40.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.06k | £26.22k | £39.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 September 2024 | 314 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 September 2024 | 314 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 February 2023 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 February 2023 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO RAISE AWARENESS AMONG THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SUTTON AND THE IMMEDIATE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 LIMES AVENUE
CARSHALTON
SM5 2AF
- Phone:
- 07467243212
- Website:
-
wallingtonanimalrescue.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window