Trustees ASHBY-DE-LA ZOUCH MUSEUM
Charity number: 513745

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carys Dawn Jeffrey | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
SIMON RICHARD AKED | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILSON | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
KELVIN WILLIAM GREENHOW | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Lumsden | Trustee | 28 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
IVAN KEITH HALLAM | Trustee | 22 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANET PATRICIA BARWOOD | Trustee | 22 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA EDWARDS | Trustee | 17 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH HILLIER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.