THIRDWAY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The alleviation of poverty of people in the United Kingdom and abroad for the public benefit The promotion and improvement of education in the United Kingdom and abroad for the public benefit The promotion and improvement of living conditions of the people in the United Kingdom and abroad for the public benefit To fund and/or support educational programmes and building projects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Afghanistan
- Angola
- Bangladesh
- Brazil
- Burkina Faso
- Central African Republic
- Ethiopia
- Guatemala
- India
- Ivory Coast
- Liberia
- Malawi
- Mali
- Mozambique
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Peru
- Sierra Leone
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 04 October 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Jordan Paisley Gillam | Chair | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mason Jay Booth | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.11k | £360 | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.04k | £1.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 January 2023 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 July 2022 | 270 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 OCT 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AND ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN AREAS OF POVERTY AROUND THE WORLD BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS TO REGISTERED CHARITIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO: · HELP PROVIDE CLEAN WATER AND HYGIENE · SUPPORT EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AND BUILDING PROJECTS IN AREAS AROUND THE WORLD IN NEED OF DEVELOPMENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
5-23
Old Street
London
EC1V9HL
EC1V 9HL
- Phone:
- 02070541145
- Email:
- sweeney@thirdwaytrust.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window