CANCER AND DEMENTIA AWARENESS AND SUPPORT FOR AFRICA (CADASA) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We create awareness and provide support on cancer and dementia for Africa. We organise lectures, seminars and symposia on the subjects with a view to enlighten anyone with the conditions or their relatives on how to be prompted for medical check up, for early detection which could prevent fatality. We do organise test centres for free medical check ups and signpost them accordingly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Egypt
- Ghana
- Kenya
- Morocco
- Nigeria
- Rwanda
- Senegal
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Uganda
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 11 December 2019: Standard registration
- CADASA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Godson Lawal | Chair | 31 May 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.41k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.13k | £1.11k | £746 | £1.04k | £600 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM CANCER AND DEMENTIA IN AFRICA THROUGH LECTURES, SYMPOSIA, LEAFLETS, RELEVANT EVENTS, ESTABLISHING HEALTH CENTRES FOR MEDICAL CHECK-UPS AND SPONSORING RESIDENTIAL CARE HOMES FOR THE ABANDONED AND HOMELESS ELDERLY MEN AND WOMEN WITH DEMENTIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
247 FORE STREET
LONDON
N18 2TY
- Phone:
- 07957363884
- Email:
- Cadasa.org@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window