HELPING LITTLE ANGELS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
- Pakistan
Governance
- 06 January 2020: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SHAHID SANDHU | Chair | 14 April 2017 |
|
|||||
TAHIR MUKHTAR ALI | Trustee | 16 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lubna Sarwar | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|||||
SHAMSA MIR-BUX | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|||||
MUHAMMAD DAUD MIKHAEIL | Trustee | 18 May 2007 |
|
|||||
ATHAR AYAZ SIDDIQUI | Trustee | 18 May 2007 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 52 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 52 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 417 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 417 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 783 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 783 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1148 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1148 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO ALLEVIATE POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PAKISTAN. 2. TO PROMOTE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PAKISTAN. 3. TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM NECESSARY, PARTICULARLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND THOSE IN NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1046 STRATFORD ROAD
HALL GREEN
BIRMINGHAM
B28 8BJ
- Phone:
- 07507437648
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window