Trustees HELPING LITTLE ANGELS

Charity number: 1187205
Charity reporting is overdue by 1151 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr SHAHID SANDHU Chair 14 April 2017
HELPING LITTLE ANGELS
Charity reporting is overdue by 420 days
TAHIR MUKHTAR ALI Trustee 16 August 2016
None on record
Lubna Sarwar Trustee 25 April 2016
HELPING LITTLE ANGELS
Charity reporting is overdue by 420 days
SHAMSA MIR-BUX Trustee 16 January 2014
HELPING LITTLE ANGELS
Charity reporting is overdue by 420 days
MUHAMMAD DAUD MIKHAEIL Trustee 18 May 2007
HELPING LITTLE ANGELS
Charity reporting is overdue by 420 days
ATHAR AYAZ SIDDIQUI Trustee 18 May 2007
HELPING LITTLE ANGELS
Charity reporting is overdue by 420 days