Leicester Navy Cadets

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FS Bulwark encourages young people into responsible adulthood using the customs of the Royal Navy and Royal Marines. We teach cadets from 8 years to 17 years, life skills that they use to further their education and chosen career. We also coach them in many different water sports that are nationally recognised. We also train in discipline, teamwork, leadership, engineering, catering, and much more
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 October 2019: CIO registration
- FLAG SHIP CUTLASS (Working name)
- Leicester Navy Cadets (Working name)
- TS CUTLASS (Working name)
- TS SABRE (Working name)
- FS BULWARK (Previous name)
- LEICESTER NAVY CADETS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derry Hand | Chair | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Sullivan | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Taylor | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vida Taylor | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.28k | £25.46k | £40.95k | £23.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.68k | £14.62k | £55.76k | £21.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | £1.50k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Oct 2019 as amended on 08 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 7-17 THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thurnby Lodge Community Centre
Thurncourt Road
LEICESTER
LE5 2NG
- Phone:
- 07913352447
- Email:
- info@navycadets.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window