Trustees VOLUNTEERING IN HEALTH
Charity number: 1182615

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alwyn Roberts Oakley | Chair | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Werner Coetzee | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Ash | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daniel Brett | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Wade | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Manuela Grossmann | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANN MEYRICK | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Hinch | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.