Accounts and annual returns BEXHILL AND ROTHER HOMELESSNESS UNITY GROUP (H.U.G.) CIO

Charity number: 1182306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 12 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 12 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 16 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 16 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 22 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 22 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 28 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 27 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 27 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window