Financial history PASS ON PRELOVED ITEMS

Charity number: 1183129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.01k £9.12k £12.76k £17.49k £18.92k
Total expenditure £6.85k £10.44k £11.09k £14.17k £16.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.00k N/A £5.00k £1.49k