WEST BRIDGFORD COLTS FOOTBALL CLUB CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides children, young people and adults with the opportunity to play football in a supportive environment. The Club operates in West Bridgford, Nottingham and involves players from that location and surrounding areas. The Club also encourages the development of high quality playing, changing and social facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
400 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 15 March 2019: CIO registration
- WBCFC (Working name)
- WEST BRIDGFORD COLTS (Working name)
- WEST BRIDGFORD COLTS FC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ilana Freestone | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Joanne Worster | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tim Robinson | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hopkins | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Traquair | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £214.37k | £186.30k | £287.95k | £351.99k | £432.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.01k | £165.31k | £315.35k | £345.02k | £442.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 | £1.00k | £540 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 17 May 2023 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 17 May 2023 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN WEST BRIDGFORD AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES TO PLAY ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST BRIDGFORD COLTS FC
THE REGATTA WAY SPORTS GROUND
REGATTA WAY
WEST BRIDGFORD
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 5AT
- Phone:
- 01158781739
- Email:
- info@westbridgfordcolts.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window