BRIGHTON & HOVE WOOD RECYCLING PROJECT LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Diverting waste wood away from landfill and incineration in East and West Sussex. Promoting the re-use and recycling of waste wood. Seeking to establish, and raise awareness of, a circular economy. Producing new products from reclaimed timber at our workshop in Brighton. Working with many disadvantaged people, offering accredited training and volunteering opportunities, within a caring environment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
98 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 04 December 2020: Standard registration
- THE WOOD STORE BRIGHTON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID NOBBS | Chair | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Westwood | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Merran Stephanie Wrigley | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil James Duffy | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ross Gilbert | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Patrick McNulty | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £237.44k | £367.36k | £439.74k | £459.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £282.45k | £393.41k | £443.06k | £474.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.58k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 March 2025 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 March 2025 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 MAR 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 DEC 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY: (A)DIVERTING RE-USABLE TIMBER AWAY FROM LANDFILL AND INCINERATION, AND PROMOTING RECYCLING OF WASTE WOOD IN EAST AND WEST SUSSEX, IN LINE WITH NATIONAL WASTE POLICY SEEKING TO ESTABLISH A CIRCULAR ECONOMY; (B)RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS RELATED TO RE-USE AND RECYCLING OF HOUSEHOLD AND INDUSTRIAL WASTE AND THE PLACE OF WOOD RECYCLING IN THE CIRCULAR ECONOMY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Wood Store
Ground Floor
Oakley House
Edward Street
Brighton
- Phone:
- 01273570500
- Email:
- info@woodrecycling.org.uk
- Website:
-
woodrecycling.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window