THE BARRY BEAVERS SWIMMING CLUB FOR THE DISABLED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Barry Beavers disabled swimming club is a long established organisation offering Halliwick qualified instruction in water techniques to people with varying disabilitites of all ages Our helpers also receive training in techniques for helping disabled swimmers, members also help in the pool The club is affiliated to The Halliwick organisation which governs swimming clubs for the disabled
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 18 July 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracey Simpson | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Margaret Jenkinson | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Noel Jenkinson | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Thomson | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nadiene Dyne | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ceri Lloyd | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Marley | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Willis | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA FINCH | Trustee | 01 January 1983 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.63k | £17.34k | £13.47k | £24.36k | £8.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.62k | £10.82k | £16.10k | £25.48k | £16.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | £350 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2024 | 325 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 March 2022 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JANUARY 1983 AS AMENDED 12 APRIL 1983 AND 24 JANUARY 2009. AS AMENDED ON 01 FEB 2018 AS AMENDED ON 08 FEB 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVE OF THE ‘ASSOCIATION’ IS THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PEOPLE IN THE REGIONAL AREA OF BARRY, SOUTH WALES, AND OTHER AREAS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM WHEN REQUIRED, BY PROMOTING AND TEACHING THE ART OF SWIMMING?
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE BARRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 CHURCH TERRACE
BARRY
CF63 1ND
- Phone:
- 01446 747683
- Email:
- patriciafinch@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window