THE RINGSIDE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To aid Ex Boxers in need
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID HARRIS | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Derek Vernett Williams | Trustee | 16 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Myka Wilshire | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Bob Edgeworth | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Burling | Trustee | 06 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN OLIVER | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAUL FAIRWEATHER | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.36k | £55.30k | £62.37k | £72.37k | £58.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.86k | £9.30k | £8.19k | £13.48k | £8.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF FORMER BOXERS AND/OR THOSE WITH A FORMER INVOLVEMENT IN BOXING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND SUPPORT SERVICES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 8
Broadview House
Garner Close
DAGENHAM
Essex
RM8 1UQ
- Phone:
- 02033406812
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window