Financial history BIRMINGHAM ASSOCIATION OF SCHOOL BUSINESS MANAGEMENT

Charity number: 1185019
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £199.38k £53.44k £73.26k £54.83k £73.38k
Total expenditure £50.87k £46.14k £75.43k £48.53k £95.59k
Income from government contracts N/A £1.20k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A