JORDIE ON YOU (JOY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 October 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mathew Maltby | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Tracy Maltby | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Clive Maltby | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Melanie Maltby | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Kayleigh Wyeth | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Joshua Maltby | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1203 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1203 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF CHILDREN IN ENGLAND WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM BEREAVEMENT OF A FAMILY MEMBER OR SUFFERS FROM MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES THEMSELVES OR HAVE A SIBLING WHO SUFFERS FROM MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY REFERRING THEM TO SUPPORT AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A HOLIDAY/RESPITE BREAK
Contact information
- Address:
-
96 WHITEHILL ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB5 8LY
- Phone:
- 07545223555
- Email:
- JordieOnYou@virginmedia.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window