BRITISH LYMPHOLOGY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the CIO is the preservation and protection of good health among people in the UK living with lymphoedema/chronic oedema - in particular by advancing education and knowledge in the field of lymphology and related subjects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malgorzata Tatar-Grycuk | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Lee Doyle | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carla Zanichelli Vives | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tamara Kosevic | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Peter Hooper-Smith | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yolande Grace Borthwick | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Victoria Hutton | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET SNEDDON | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Riches | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Hayley Elwell | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Brown | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £163.07k | £145.23k | £108.16k | £219.44k | £226.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165.94k | £82.57k | £94.38k | £174.41k | £218.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED ON DATED 03 SEP 2019 AMENDED ON 16 NOV 2020 AMENDED ON 24 NOV 2023 as amended on 07 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
The object of the CIO is the preservation and protection of good health among people in the United Kingdom living with lymphoedema/chronic oedema in particular by: (1) advancing education and knowledge in the field of lymphoedema and related subjects; (2) fostering interest in and co-ordinating strategies for influencing and supporting improvement in management and research related to chronic oedema, particularly lymphoedema; (3) holding a register of specialist centres in the United Kingdom and Ireland; (4) improving the knowledge, expertise and skills of all health care professionals.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 7153
Lichfield
WS14 4JW
- Phone:
- 01452790178
- Email:
- admin@thebls.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window