Financial history GRISTHORPE AND LEBBERSTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1187364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £5.76k £7.62k £9.90k £9.57k £9.64k
Total expenditure £6.09k £7.11k £10.40k £7.39k £7.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A