THE WHITE LION FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The White Lion Foundation is a UK wildlife charity (TWLF) with an ambitious vision for the future of global wildlife conservation, aimed at world-class high-impact projects for the protection and welfare of wild animals. TWLF is dedicated to the support of scientific endeavour, and the engagement of communities through progressive education and awareness campaigns.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Pakistan
- South Africa
- Turkey
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.12k | £9.81k | £555 | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.97k | £5.27k | £5.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 October 2024 | 272 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 October 2024 | 272 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 October 2023 | 264 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 October 2023 | 264 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS WILD ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR WILD ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window