SHEVINGTON AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Shevington and District Community Association are: 1. To promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Shevington . . .to advance education and provide facilities . . . for recreation and leisure time occupation . . . improving the conditions of life especially for the lonely and isolated in our community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wigan
Governance
- 28 April 1983: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Vivienne Powell | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alan James Mohring | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Othlyn Flash - Ellis | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL CROSBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN BAXTER WHITELEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £445 | £5.32k | £3.84k | £10.91k | £5.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.55k | £3.09k | £7.24k | £9.34k | £8.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £722 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 20 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 21 March 2021 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 FEBRUARY 1983
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SHEVINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATION THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCUATION AND TO PROVIDE FAICILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
SHEVINGTON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
69 Whitehall Avenue
Appley Bridge
Wigan
Lancashire
WN6 9JY
- Phone:
- 07711816922
- Email:
- jwvjmaloney@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window