WE MIND & KELLY MATTERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We Mind & Kelly Matters now "trading as" Kelly's Heroes was formed in 2019 after the devastating loss of our beautiful daughter, sister and friend Kelly Francesca Hewitt. Our aim is to raise much needed funds for mental health projects in Northamptonshire and beyond so that anyone struggling with their Mental Health or affected by suicide can receive help and support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 March 2019: CIO registration
- Kelly's Heroes (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachael Hewitt | Chair | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Wright | Trustee | 15 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lee Paul Foster | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Thomas | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Hanger | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ben Merville Thomas | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kerry York | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Hewitt | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.96k | £137.42k | £214.16k | £579.07k | £217.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.00k | £19.86k | £114.45k | £407.51k | £312.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £197.28k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £579.07k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £127.63k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £279.88k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 25 MAR 2019 AMENDED ON 19 APR 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH THROUGH: THE FINANCIAL SUPPORT OF MENTAL HEALTH, SUICIDE PREVENTION AND BEREAVEMENT CHARITIES THE PROVISION OF BOTH FACE TO FACE AND ONLINE COUNSELLING THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, AND EDUCATION TALKS TO RAISE AWARENESS OF MENTAL HEALTH, SUICIDE PREVENTION AND BEREAVEMENT SUPPORT FOR SUICIDE BEREAVEMENT FOR INDIVIDUALS, FAMILIES AND GROUPS
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 DODDINGTON ROAD
WELLINGBOROUGH
NN8 2JH
- Phone:
- 07814382701
- Email:
- hello@kellysheroes.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window