BETHEL BAPTIST CHURCH FARNHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purposes of the Church are: the advancement of the Christian faith such other charitable purposes that put into practice the Christian faith such as the prevention and relief of need, hardship and sickness; the advancement of education; etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Andrew Richard Brooks | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Frederick McNeight | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Johannes Marinus de Jong | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard David Honeysett | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Richard Edwards | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Clothier | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Helen Brooks | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Keith John Holburn | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Aug 2019 as amended on 25 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE: 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN FARNHAM, SURREY AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND 3.1.2 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE;
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bethel Baptist Church
Bethel Lane
Upper Hale
FARNHAM
GU9 0QA
- Phone:
- 01252719243
- Email:
- admin@bethelbaptist.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window