Financial history LIFE CHURCH MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1185953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £8.66m £1.85m £1.53m
Total expenditure £0 £0 £2.64m £2.32m £1.57m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £239.71k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £7.87m £1.58m £1.09m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £402.84k £108.19k £226.00k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £106.83k £87.14k £214.00k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £35 £130 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £279.91k £81.64k £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £2.25m £1.78m £1.35m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £226.00k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 £64.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £39.00k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £394.58k £537.83k £0