THE POTTERS HOUSE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP WALSALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN THE ATTACHED SCHEDULE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD - Through means of Church services, outreaches, youth gorups and other like activies. -THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY REGARDLESS OF NATIONALITY, RELIGIOUS POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Walsall
Governance
- 10 May 2019: CIO registration
- POTTERS HOUSE CHRISTIAN CENTRE WALSALL (Working name)
- POTTERS HOUSE WALSALL (Working name)
- WALSALL CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wesley de Costa | Chair | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Claxton | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Joseph Gabriel | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.02k | £16.48k | £37.26k | £51.60k | £71.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.26k | £14.57k | £28.34k | £56.17k | £76.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 118 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 4.1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN THE ATTACHED SCHEDULE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; 4.2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY REGARDLESS OF NATIONALITY, RELIGIOUS POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND 4.3) SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29-31 Old Square
Walsall
WS1 1QF
- Phone:
- 07710470121
- Email:
- phwalsall@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window