TATTENHOE FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Volunteer run grassroots football club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 16 October 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lewis Clifford | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sidney Carter | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katie Watkins | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chris Dawson | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.33k | £97.86k | £120.34k | £147.40k | £157.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.22k | £82.70k | £140.44k | £120.42k | £170.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 23 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 MAR 2019 AS AMENDED ON 15 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
134 LYNMOUTH CRESCENT
FURZTON
MILTON KEYNES
MK4 1LQ
- Phone:
- 07702985458
- Email:
- chairman@tattenhoefc.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window