Accounts and annual returns FRIENDZ & CO.

Charity number: 1185532
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days
Annual return 06 April 2023 24 August 2024 200 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2023 24 August 2024 200 days late
Annual return 06 April 2022 16 March 2023 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2022 16 March 2023 38 days late
Annual return 06 April 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Annual return 06 April 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2020 06 April 2021 59 days late