SHEFFIELD ADVICE CENTRES GROUP EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 12 May 1983: Standard registration
- 19 January 2004: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 19 January 2004: Funds transferred to 1094368 ADVICE CENTRE SUPPORT IN SHEFFIELD
- S A C G (Working name)
- THE SHEFFIELD ADVICE CENTRES EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST 21 JULY 1982, SCHEME OF 29 SEPTEMBER 1998 AND CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 OCTOBER 1998.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE MEMBERS OF THE ADVICE AGENCIES, MEMBERS OF THE LEGAL, SOCIAL AND COMMUNITY WORK PROFESSIONS, LOCAL AND OTHER PUBLIC AUTHORITIES, AND INTERESTED MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY BY THE IMPROVEMENT AND DIFFUSION OF KNOWLEDGE OF THE LAW AND THE PRACTICE OF THE LAW AND ITS ADMINISTRATION HAVING REGARD ESPECIALLY TO THOSE AREAS OF THE LAW WHICH ARE OF PARTICULAR CONCERN TO POOR PEOPLE OR ARE DIRECTED TOWARDS THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.