ALLI FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of financial hardship of young people by making grants of money and other finance for providing, or paying, for items, services or facilities so that they can further their education, sporting or employment goals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 March 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Taiwo Babatunde Alli | Chair | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kehinde Alli | Trustee | 31 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Agboola Afolabi Ogundeyin | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oluwemimo Abolanle Adeniji | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amaka Williams | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY AND OTHER FINANCE FOR PROVIDING, OR PAYING, FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES SO THAT THEY CAN FURTHER THEIR EDUCATION, SPORTING OR EMPLOYMENT GOALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 Harlescott Road
LONDON
SE15 3BZ
- Phone:
- 07734960767
- Email:
- kehindeballi@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window