RELIGIONS FOR PEACE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate throughout the United Kingdom by holding events, making grants, undertaking projects and providing advocacy for our charitable objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 June 2020: CIO registration
- 23 November 2021: Funds received from 1109076 WORLD CONFERENCE OF RELIGIONS FOR PEACE (UK CHAPTE...
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CINDERELLA LAI-SI LEE | Chair | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Ravinder Kaur Nijjar | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Shaykh Ibrahim Mogra | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|||||||||
James Bruce Cresswell | Trustee | 24 June 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £47.15k | £72.69k | £53.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £47.71k | £87.92k | £112.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 24 Jun 2020 as amended on 23 May 2023
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: * MONITORING AND REPORTING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; * RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; * RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; * PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; AND * PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS. 2. TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: A) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS; B) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS; AND C) ENCOURAGING DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITH GROUPS TO CO-OPERATE WITH EACH OTHER AND TO WORK TOGETHER ON MUTUALLY BENEFICIAL PROJECTS AS A WAY OF FOSTERING AND IMPROVING RELIGIOUS HARMONY. 3. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT. 4. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON THE SUBJECTS OF CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND PEACE, BASED ON THE TEACHINGS OF DIFFERENT WORLD RELIGIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Daly Stephens & Co
106-108 Burnt Oak Broadway
Edgware
HA8 0BE
- Phone:
- 07886777876
- Email:
- CHAIR@RFPUK.ORG
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window