Financial history LEAMINGTON CHAMBER ORCHESTRA SOCIETY

Charity number: 513811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.43k £2.70k £6.54k £12.88k £10.34k
Total expenditure £4.23k £2.09k £7.65k £7.23k £9.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A