ST. IVES SAILING SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of St. Ives Sailing School is the promotion of community participation in healthy recreation for the benefit of the residents of Cornwall and surrounding regions by the provision of facilities for learning to sail. We apply for funding so that we can train people to sail, in order that they might benefit from the mental and physical health advantages that this activity bestows.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 10 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shirley Russell | Chair | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Harris | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.72k | £678 | £9.06k | £666 | £1.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.72k | £678 | £5.00k | £1.50k | £2.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.49k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF CORNWALL AND SURROUNDING REGIONS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEARNING TO SAIL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE DINGHY PEN
BACK LANE
ST. IVES
TR26 1LS
- Phone:
- 07943638399
- Email:
- sheave@zoho.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window