Financial history THE GREENBANK PROJECT

Charity number: 513814
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £3.32m £3.15m £2.87m £2.32m £2.36m
Total expenditure £3.25m £3.04m £2.85m £2.41m £2.70m
Income from government contracts £2.38m £1.80m £1.63m £1.74m £1.92m
Income from government grants £394.64k £600 £106.30k N/A £72.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £29.12k £21.46k £73.52k £426 £5.10k
Income - Other trading activities £4.97k £0 £180.48k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.17m £49.32k £2.61m £2.32m £2.36m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £100 £0 £0 £43 £102
Income - Other £118.56k £0 £7.46k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £14.01k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.25m £3.04m £2.85m £2.41m £2.70m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £21.92k £10.80k £11.00k £12.00k £13.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0